EP0744307 - An improved double-acting shock absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. C.so Agnelli, 200 10135 Torino / IT | [1996/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Giusto, Nevio Via Vanchiglia 24 10100 Torino TO / IT | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Di Francesco, Gianni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | Di Francesco, Gianni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96107742.7 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00413 | 25.05.1995 Original published format: IT TO950413 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744307 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744307 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/08, F16F9/504 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
F16F9/504 (EP);
B60G17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1996/48] | Title | German: | Verbesserter, doppeltwirkender Stossdämpfer | [1996/48] | English: | An improved double-acting shock absorber | [1996/48] | French: | Amortisseur à double action amélioré | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 16.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.07.2000 | SE | 26.10.2000 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/27] | SE | 26.10.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57154539 ; | [A]US2957703 (ROSS HOWARD S) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 3; figure -; claim - *; | [XA]BE660773 (RESSORTS DU NORD S.A.) [X] 1-3 * figure -; claim - * [A] 5; | [XA]DE1209007 (RHEINMETALL GMBH) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 5; | [A]US5154442 (MILLIKEN DOUGLAS L [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 25 - column 8, line 23; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821218), vol. 006, no. 260, Database accession no. (M - 180), & JP57154539 A 19820924 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |