EP0743380 - High tenacity propylene polymer fibre and process for making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2002 [2002/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states BASELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | ||
Former [1996/47] | For all designated states MONTELL NORTH AMERICA INC. 2801 Centerville Road New Castle County Delaware / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinoca, Leonardo 1, Via Santa Croce 05035 Narni, Terni / IT | 02 /
Africano, Renato 29, Via Pacinotti 44100 Ferrara / IT | 03 /
Braca, Giancarlo 13, Via Renato Donatelli 05100 Terni / IT | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96107784.9 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00982 | 15.05.1995 Original published format: IT MI950982 | [1996/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0743380 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0743380 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | [1997/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0743380 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/46, C08L23/04, C08L23/10 | [1996/47] | CPC: |
D01F6/46 (EP,US);
D01F6/06 (KR);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (EP,US);
C08L2203/12 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
C08L2207/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US);
Y10T442/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/06, C08F2500/01, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/11, C08F2500/15 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/47] | Title | German: | Propylenpolymerfaser mit hoher Festigkeit und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1996/47] | English: | High tenacity propylene polymer fibre and process for making it | [1996/47] | French: | Fibre de polymère de propylène à haute ténacité et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2000/38] |
Former [1996/47] | Fibre de polymère de propylène et procédé pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 19.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 25.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2001 | FI | 18.07.2001 | SE | 18.10.2001 | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/05] | SE | 18.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06313207 ; | [A]EP0028844 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]EP0190889 (HIMONT INC [US]); | [A]EP0227010 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [A]EP0351866 (HIMONT INC [US]); | [D]US4916198 (SCHEVE B JOSEPH [US], et al); | [A]EP0384431 (HIMONT INC [US]); | [D]US5047485 (DENICOLA ANTHONY J JR [US]); | [A]EP0625545 (HIMONT INC [US]); | by applicant | US4916198 | EP0400333 | US5047445 | US5047485 |