EP0743393 - Paper material made from a fibrous pulp of industrial textile waste and exhausted sugarbeet pulp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARTIERA DI CORDENONS S.p.A. Via Pasch, 95 33084 Cordenons / IT | For all designated states ERIDANIA S.p.A. Corso Andrea Podestà 2 16128 Genova / IT | [1996/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capretti, Giorgio Via XXV Aprile, 73 20092 Cinisello balsamo / IT | 02 /
Focher, Bonaventura Via del Nono, 1 26012 Castelleone / IT | 03 /
Monacelli, Giorgio Via Piave, 25/F 33170 Pordenone / IT | 04 /
Vallini, Giorgio Via Boselli, 7/10 16100 Genova / IT | 05 /
Pezzi, Giorgio Via Emilia 32 29010 Sarmato / IT | 06 /
Gilberti, Ferruccio Via Senato, 16 20121 Milano / IT | [1996/47] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96107793.0 | 15.05.1996 | [1996/47] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00395 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: IT TO950395 | [1996/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0743393 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0743393 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H11/00, A01N3/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
D21H11/14 (EP);
D21H11/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/47] | D21H11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1996/47] | Title | German: | Papiermaterial hergestellt aus einer fibrösen Pulpe von industriellem Textilabfall und ausgelaugter Zuckerrübe | [1996/47] | English: | Paper material made from a fibrous pulp of industrial textile waste and exhausted sugarbeet pulp | [1996/47] | French: | Matériau de papier produit à partir d'une pâte fibreuse de déchets textiles industriels et de la pâte de betterave épuisée | [1996/47] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/39] | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 25.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/10] | 11.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU1313407 ; | [A]JPH05331794 ; | [X]DE3137232 (BRUMMER JOHANN GEORG DIPL BRAU [DE]) [X] 18 * example *; | [A]US4832791 (DETERT ERNST-ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,13,15-17* examples;; claim 30 *; | [A]FR2668508 (ARJOMARI EUROP [FR]) [A] 1,9,13,15-17 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0644293 (FAVINI CARTIERA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3,13,15-17 * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 02, Database accession no. 88-012609, XP002046008 & SU1313407 A 19870530 (MOSCOW NAT ECONOMY INST) [A] 18 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 03, Database accession no. 94-023409, XP002010497 & JPH05331794 A 19931214 (KANEBO MENSHI KK) [A] 1,2,9,13,15-17 * abstract * |