EP0757948 - Device for marking of reservations in a seat providing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linne, Olaf, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstr. 12 31167 Bockenem / DE | 02 /
Zurmuehl, Uwe, Dr. rer. nat. Sandstr. 8A 31180 Giesen / DE | [1997/07] | Application number, filing date | 96107848.2 | 17.05.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | DE1995129076 | 08.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19529076 | [1997/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0757948 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0757948 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61D41/04 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
B61D41/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1997/07] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Kennzeichnung von Reservierungen in einem Platzangebotssystem | [1997/07] | English: | Device for marking of reservations in a seat providing system | [1997/07] | French: | Dispositif pour le marquage des réservations dans un système d'offre des sièges | [1997/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 04.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0419990 (ASCOM ZELCOM AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 18 * * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 19; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 5,6; | [A]EP0659625 (AEG SENSORSYSTEME GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPH02249758 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901220), vol. 14, no. 575, Database accession no. (M - 1062), & JP02249758 A 19901005 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |