EP0750049 - Ferritic steel and its manufacture and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thyssen Stahl Aktiengesellschaft Kaiser-Wilhelm-Strasse 100 47166 Duisburg / DE | [1996/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrhardt, Bertram Lisastrasse 68 47226 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Heidelauf, Thomas Hermann-Löns-Strasse 12b 46537 Dinslaken / DE | 03 /
Schaumann, Thomas Wilhelm Panderstrasse 26b 47199 Duisburg / DE | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96107884.7 | 17.05.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | DE1995121836 | 16.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19521836 | DE1996105696 | 16.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19605696 | [1996/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0750049 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, C22C38/06 | [1996/52] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/52] | Extension states | LT | 17.05.1996 | LV | 17.05.1996 | SI | 17.05.1996 | Title | German: | Ferritischer Stahl und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und Verwendung | [1996/52] | English: | Ferritic steel and its manufacture and use | [1996/52] | French: | Acier ferritique; sa fabrication et son utilisation | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06264183 ; | [X]JPH0559485 ; | [A]FR2253841 (CENTRO SPERIMENT METALLURG [IT]); | [A]US4316753 (KANEKO KUNISHIGE, et al); | [X]BE899253 (GIELEN PAUL M E L) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0586704 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]); | [PX]US5470529 (NOMURA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2* example -; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941216), vol. 018, no. 668, Database accession no. (C - 1289), & JP06264183 A 19940920 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930714), vol. 017, no. 373, Database accession no. (C - 1083), & JP05059485 A 19930309 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2924340 | EP0072867 | DE3440752 |