EP0744438 - Tire with silica reinforced tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2001 [2001/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucas, Danielle 8 Rue de Grentzingen Welsdorf, L-7723 / LU | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Leitz, Paul Goodyear Technical Center-Luxembourg Patent-Department L-7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [1996/48] | Application number, filing date | 96107888.8 | 17.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | US19950449864 | 24.05.1995 Original published format: US 449864 | [1996/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0744438 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744438 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L9/00, B60C1/00 | [1996/48] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08L81/04 (KR);
C08L2205/025 (KR);
Y10S152/905 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L9/00, C08L2666/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/48] | Title | German: | Reifen mit Kieselsäure verstärkter Lauffläche | [1996/48] | English: | Tire with silica reinforced tread | [1996/48] | French: | Pneu avec bande de roulement renforcée par de la silice | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/48] | 26.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0638610 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * |