Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0749942
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.07.2000 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] |
14.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
13.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.07.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.03.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.03.1999 |
First examination report |
|
25.01.1999 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
20.11.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] |
03.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.03.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.05.1998 [1998/20] |
06.03.1998 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] |
04.02.1998 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
08.11.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] |