EP0761113 - Skiboot comprising two parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonaventure, Laurent 4, rue des Lilas 74960 Cran-Gevrier / FR | [1997/11] | Application number, filing date | 96108152.8 | 22.05.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | FR19950010584 | 06.09.1995 Original published format: FR 9510584 | [1997/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0761113 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0761113 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
A43B5/04 (EP,US);
A43B7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1997/11] | Title | German: | Zweiteiliger Schistiefel | [1997/11] | English: | Skiboot comprising two parts | [1997/11] | French: | Chaussure de ski en deux parties | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/29] | 03.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2022109 (VOGEL RAIMUND) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0572862 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP0572775 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0619958 (NORDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |