EP0751256 - Doctoring assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 89509 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaipf, Horst Siedlungsring 59 89415 Lauingen / DE | 02 /
Henninger, Christoph Seestrasse 69 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [1997/01] | Application number, filing date | 96108388.8 | 25.05.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | DE1995210486U | 30.06.1995 Original published format: DE 29510486 U | [1997/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0751256 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0751256 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | [1997/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751256 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D21H25/12, B05C5/02, B05C11/02 | [1997/21] | CPC: |
D21H25/12 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/01] | D21H25/12, B05C11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, IT, NL, SE [1997/01] | Title | German: | Rakel-Baugruppe | [1997/01] | English: | Doctoring assembly | [1997/01] | French: | Ensemble de dosage | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 25.05.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 24.04.2002 | NL | 24.04.2002 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 24.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2040738 (BELOIT CORP) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0541502 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [A] 1-6* figures 1-6 *; | [DA]DE4308302 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]EP0633353 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4341341 (JAGENBERG AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figure 1 * |