EP0745506 - Slidable rear seat for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [1996/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aragno, Franco Via Magenta 8 10093 Collegno / IT | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al c/o Studio Torta, Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96108444.9 | 28.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | IT1995TO00445 | 30.05.1995 Original published format: IT TO950445 | [1996/49] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0745506 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0745506 | Date: | 28.05.1997 | [1997/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745506 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/06, B60N2/36 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B60N2/4263 (EP);
B60N2/065 (EP);
B60N2/22 (EP);
B60N2/3013 (EP);
B60N2/305 (EP);
B60N2/3093 (EP);
B60N2/4221 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1996/49] | Title | German: | Verschiebbarer Rücksitz für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1996/49] | English: | Slidable rear seat for a motor vehicle | [1996/49] | French: | Siège arrière coulissant pour un véhicule automobile | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 05.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.04.2000 | SE | 26.07.2000 | [2002/26] |
Former [2001/26] | SE | 26.07.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JPH07164942 ; | [YA]FR1427847 (SIMCA AUTOMOBILES SA) [Y] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]FR1499448 (RENAULT) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2449552 (RENAULT) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO8303081 (VOLKSWAGEN BRASIL [BR]); | [Y]EP0434636 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4 * column 2, line 11 - line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2691681 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2707933 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]FR2707934 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07164942 A 19950627 (MAZDA MOTOR CORP) [AP] 1 * abstract * |