EP0744843 - Data communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SimonsVoss Technologies AG Feringastrasse 4 85774 Unterföhring / DE | [2004/42] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states Simons & Voss Identifikationssysteme GmbH Schulstrasse 4 38875 Königshütte / DE | ||
Former [1996/48] | For all designated states Simons, Oliver Schleissheimerstrasse 224 80797 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Voss, Ludger Abenthumstrasse 4 81671 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simons, Oliver Schleissheimer Strasse 224 80797 München / DE | [1996/48] | Representative(s) | Stellbrink, Axel Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Stellbrink, Axel Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/48] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108471.2 | 28.05.1996 | [1996/48] | Priority number, date | DE1995119450 | 26.05.1995 Original published format: DE 19519450 | [1996/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0744843 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0744843 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0744843 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L29/02, E05B49/00, G07C9/00, H04B1/16 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
G06K7/0008 (EP);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
G07C9/28 (EP);
H04L12/12 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
G07B15/063 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1996/48] | H04B7/26, H04L29/02, E05B49/00, G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/48] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungssystem | [1996/48] | English: | Data communication system | [1996/48] | French: | Système de communication de données | [1996/48] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05009686.6 / EP1585268 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9510141 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,8 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 17 * [Y] 2-4,6; | [DYA]DE4230011 (FLUOROWARE INC [US]) [DY] 2-4,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 19 * [A] 1,8; | [A]EP0502566 (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,5,6,8 * abstract * * column 6, line 12 - line 32 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 19 * | Examination | US5299117 | GB1168509 |