EP0752508 - Façade covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLACHGLAS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Siemensstrasse 1-3 90705 Fürth / DE | [1997/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faltin, Reinhard Springestrasse 43 45894 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Wildner, Alex, Dipl.-Ing. Birkenpfad 7 44869 Bochum / DE | 03 /
Faber, Josef, Dipl.-Ing. Wittener Strasse 31 45884 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Niemann, Uwe Ahornstrasse 41 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Niemann, Uwe, Dr.-Ing. Ahornstrasse 41 45134 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108554.5 | 29.05.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | DE1995210745U | 01.07.1995 Original published format: DE 29510745 U | [1997/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0752508 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0752508 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
E04F13/0821 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | Fassadenbekleidung | [1997/02] | English: | Façade covering | [1997/02] | French: | Couverture de façade | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 01.12.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/24] | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE29510745U (FLACHGLAS AG) [PX] 1-14 * figure -; claims 1-14 *; | [A]DE3203467 (PROFIL VERTRIEB GMBH) [A] 1,5,12 * page 16 - page 20; figure - *; | [A]EP0531869 (SIEMENS SOLAR GMBH) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 47; figure - *; | [A]DE3309614 (WAGNER PETER DIPL ING) [A] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 14, paragraph 1; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0167032 (BWM DUEBEL & MONTAGETECH) [A] 1,12 * page 6, paragraph L - page 10; figure - *; | [AD]DE3018398 (PROFIL VERTRIEB GMBH); | [A]FR2598452 (QUILLE ENTREPRISE) |