EP0745906 - Toner for developing electrostatic images, and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yachi, Shinya, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Inaba, Koji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kato, Kazunori, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108597.4 | 30.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | JP19950156772 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: JP 15677295 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745906 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745906 | Date: | 03.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/087 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
G03G9/08706 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (KR);
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/08708 (EP,US);
G03G9/08711 (EP,US);
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/08795 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/49] | Title | German: | Toner für die Entwicklung elektrostatischer Bilder und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/49] | English: | Toner for developing electrostatic images, and process for producing the same | [1996/49] | French: | Toner pour révélateur d'images électrostatiques et procédé pour sa préparation | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/26] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5380616 (AOKI MITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]US4908290 (WATANABE YOICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9 - column 12 *; | [A]EP0533172 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * example - *; | [A]EP0573705 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |