Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] |
13.06.2003 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
11.06.2003 | Renewal fee | |
09.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.10.2002 | Change - German title | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
05.06.2002 | Renewal fee | |
09.05.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
11.03.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
16.11.2001 | First examination report | |
05.11.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
08.06.2001 | Renewal fee | |
31.05.2000 | Renewal fee | |
10.06.1999 | Renewal fee | |
29.05.1998 | Renewal fee | |
18.10.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
18.10.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |