Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2756482B | Global Dossier | 25.05.1998 | B2 | JPH08323272 | 10.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0745429 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2003 | B1 | EP0745429 | 04.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2177542 | 05.09.2006 | C | CA2177542 | 01.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1053395C | 14.06.2000 | C | CN1140645 | 22.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69629246T | 15.04.2004 | T2 | DE69629246D1 | 04.09.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0180086B | 20.03.1999 | B1 | KR960040455 | 17.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5989643 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | JP15716895 | 31.05.1995 |