EP0745429 - Layout for positioning robots in an automobile painting line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Osamu 1-501, 169-1, Okubo, Okubo-Cho Akashi-Shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Fusama, Masaki 7-4, Karibadai 4-Chome, Nishi-Ku Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken / JP | 03 /
Naemura, Masao 2-33-202, Nishimaiko 6-Chome, Tarumi-Ku Kobe-Shi, Hyogo-Ken / JP | 04 /
Yamaoka, Yasuhiro 1-101-502, Chiyogaoka, Chikusa-Ku Nagoya-Shi, Aichi-Ken / JP | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/49] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108668.3 | 30.05.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | JP19950157168 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: JP 15716895 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0745429 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745429 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/04, B05B15/12 | [1996/49] | CPC: |
B05B13/0452 (EP,KR,US);
B05B13/0431 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/49] | Title | German: | Anordnung für die Aufstellung von Lackierrobotern in einer Lackierstrasse | [2002/49] | English: | Layout for positioning robots in an automobile painting line | [1996/49] | French: | Disposition des appareil-robots dans une ligne d'application | [1996/49] |
Former [1996/49] | Anordnung für die Aufstellung von Lackierrobotern in einer lackierstrasse | Examination procedure | 30.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0421791 (TAIKISHA KK [JP]) [X] 2,4,5 * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 43; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1,3,6,7; | [XY]WO9503133 (TRALLFA ROBOT AS [NO], et al) [X] 2,4 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 5; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1,3,7; | [XY]GB2190312 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2,4 * page 5, line 104 - page 8, line 15; figures 1,3,4,6 * [Y] 1,3,7; | [XY]US4977000 (MURAYAMA JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 2,4 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1,3,7; | [Y]US5020472 (KIBA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 61; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4698005 (KIKUCHI UHEE [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 2, lines 28-41; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0480663 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [Y] 7 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 26; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]JPS588570 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [Y] 6 * see abstract;; figures 1-3 * |