EP0813037 - Heat exchanger, particularly for a boiler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIESSMANN WERKE GmbH & CO. Industriestrasse 35108 Allendorf/Eder / DE | [1997/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofbauer, Peter Im Ortsgrund 1 D-35066 Frankenberg/Eder / DE | 02 /
Hager, Michael Hermann Strasse 113 D-35037 Marburg/lahn / DE | 03 /
Strauss, Rolf-Peter Schrälingstrasse 54a D-35066 Frankenberg/Eder / DE | [1997/51] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/51] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96108744.2 | 31.05.1996 | [1997/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813037 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/02, F28F3/04, F24H1/43, B21C37/20 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
F28F3/042 (EP);
B21C37/20 (EP);
F24H1/43 (EP);
F28D7/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/51] | Title | German: | Wärmeübertrager, insbesondere für einen Heizkessel | [1997/51] | English: | Heat exchanger, particularly for a boiler | [1997/51] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur, en particulier pour une chaudière | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/08] | 22.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0467250 (VIESSMANN HANS [DE]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 28 - column 6, line 37; figures 3-6 *; | [XY]FR1567831 (AIR PREHEATER CO. INC.) [X] 1,8 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 33; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,5-7,11; | [DYA]WO9416272 (LE MER JOSEPH [FR]) [DY] 2,7 * page 8, line 22 - page 25, line 9; figures 1,15,18,25,26 * [A] 10; | [Y]EP0298369 (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) [Y] 5 * column A; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0162827 (ARMATURJONSSON AB [SE]) [Y] 6,11 * page 2, line 34 - page 5, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE2856678 (UNITED STIRLING AB & CO) [X] 1 * page 6, line 7 - page 8, line 23; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | WO9416272 |