blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0749182

EP0749182 - Electrical connector with terminal tail aligning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DE
published on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Nelson, Richard A.
2814 Miller Road
Geneva, IL 60134 / US
02 / Bixler, Craig A.
853 Chatham
Elmhurst, IL 60126 / US
03 / Landgraf, Glenn A.
12 So. Loomis Street
Naperville, IL 60540 / US
[1996/51]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/51]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100
65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date96108902.604.06.1996
[1996/51]
Priority number, dateUS1995049050214.06.1995         Original published format: US 490502
[1996/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0749182
Date:18.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0749182
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1996
ClassificationIPC:H01R12/18, H01R12/20
[2000/24]
CPC:
H01R12/7064 (EP,US); H01R12/724 (EP,US); H01R13/26 (EP,US);
H01R43/205 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1996/51]H01R23/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1996/51]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit Ausrichtungsvorrichtung für Anschlussenden[1996/51]
English:Electrical connector with terminal tail aligning device[1996/51]
French:Connecteur électrique ayant un dispositif d'alignement des extrémités des bornes[1996/51]
Examination procedure24.05.1997Examination requested  [1997/31]
07.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2001Fee for grant paid
06.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE20.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
[2003/30]
Former [2003/17]GB04.06.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2095485  (ITT) [X] 1,7 * page 1, line 41 - line 62 * * page 1, line 118 - line 125 * * page 2, line 11 - line 35; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]EP0335160  (HARTING ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 2; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0635912  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1* column 4, line 41 - line 49; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0639873  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,3-5,7 * column 1, line 23 - line 38; figures 5,6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.