Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0747358 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2000 | A3 | EP0747358 | 11.12.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI951208 | 08.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1276680 | 03.11.1997 | B1 | ITMI951208 | 08.12.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI951208 | 08.06.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5763624 | 09.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI951208 | 08.06.1995 |