EP0747358 - Process for the synthesis of 1-pyridiniumpropane-3-sulphonate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galvanevet S.r.l. Via Vigevano, 61 28069 San Martino Di Trecate / IT | [1999/44] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Galvanevet S.p.A. Via Vigevano, 61 28069 San Martino Di Trecate, Novara / IT | ||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Galvanevet S.r.l. Via Vigevano, 61 28069 San Martino Di Trecate / IT | ||
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states Galvanevet S.p.A. Via Vigevano, 61 28069 San Martino Di Trecate, Novara / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minisci, Francesco Via Marescalchi, 19 20133 Milano / IT | 02 /
Serri, Annamaria Via Pordenone, 13 20132 Milano / IT | 03 /
Fontana, Francesca Via Illirico, 11 20133 Milano / IT | 04 /
Baima, Roberto Via Pianca, 21 28100 Novara / IT | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Vatti, Paolo, et al Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Snc Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Vatti, Paolo, Dr. Ing., et al Fumero-Studio Consulenza Brevetti Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109074.3 | 05.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI01208 | 08.06.1995 Original published format: IT MI951208 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747358 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747358 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/127, C07D213/20 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
C07D213/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT [1996/50] | Extension states | SI | 08.06.1996 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Pyridiniumpropan-3-sulfonat | [1996/50] | English: | Process for the synthesis of 1-pyridiniumpropane-3-sulphonate | [1996/50] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 1-pyridiniumpropane-3-sulfonate | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 02.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/33] | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | PL147998 [ ] (INSTYTUT MECHANIKI PRECYZYJNEJ); | [A]US4148797 (PLUSS KURT, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2803493 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3541098 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0293913 (RASCHIG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0499043 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0583672 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910318), vol. 114, no. 11, Database accession no. 101738z, page 723, column 1, XP002127983 [A] 1 * abstract * |