EP0747920 - Edge electron emitters for an array of feds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1996/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moyer, Curtis D. 4006 E. Thistle Landing Drive Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US | 02 /
Whalin, Jeffrey A. 15925 E. Richwood Avenue Fountain Hills, Arizona 85268 / US | 03 /
Morrow, Wayne 4814 E. Monte Way Phoenix, Arizona 85044 / US | 04 /
Voight, Steven A. 18 S. Silverado Street Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1996/50] | Spaulding, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property Operations, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96109158.4 | 07.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | US19950489017 | 08.06.1995 Original published format: US 489017 | [1996/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0747920 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0747920 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01J1/30, H01J9/02, H01J31/12 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
H01J9/025 (EP,US);
H01J31/15 (KR);
H01J29/467 (EP,US);
H01J3/022 (EP,US);
H01J2201/30423 (EP,US);
H01J2329/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/50] | Title | German: | Randelektronenquellen für eine Feldemissionsanordnung | [1996/50] | English: | Edge electron emitters for an array of feds | [1996/50] | French: | Emetteurs d'électrons par le bord pour un réseau de dispositifs à émission de champ | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/08] | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.07.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL6515150 (N.V. PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN, EINDHOVEN) [A] 1,4* page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 25 *; | [X]US3953756 (MONFROY HENRI, et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 17 - line 26 *; | [A]EP0045350 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 21, paragraph 2 * * figure 10 *; | [A]DE3544467 (GSCHWANDTNER ALEXANDER DR PHIL) [A] 1 * column 1, line 57 - line 63 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5214347 (GRAY HENRY F [US]) [A] 2 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 32 - line 43 * |