EP0814145 - Process and catalyst for upgrading heavy hydrocarbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intevep SA Apartado 76343 Caracas 1010 A / VE | [1997/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carrazza, Jose Residencias Albonada Apto. 51A, Sector El Picacho San Antonio de Los Altos / VE | 02 /
Pereira, Pedro Urb. Los Salias, Res. Sierra, Piso 2, Apto. 2A San Antonio de Los Altos / VE | 03 /
Martinez, Nelson Qta. Emyli, Calle 1, Urb. Parque El Retiro San Antonio de Los Altos / VE | [1997/52] | Representative(s) | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1997/52] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. G.F. Hiebsch, Dipl.-Ing. K. Peege, Dipl.-Ing. N. Behrmann, Heinrich-Weber-Platz 1 78224 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109312.7 | 11.06.1996 | [1997/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0814145 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0814145 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/32 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
C10G47/32 (EP,US);
C10G11/00 (KR);
C10G11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [1997/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator zum Verbessern von schweren Kohlenwasserstoffen | [1997/52] | English: | Process and catalyst for upgrading heavy hydrocarbon | [1997/52] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur pour revalorisation d'hydrocarbures lourdes | [1997/52] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR612327 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [DA]US3676331 (PITCHFORD ARMIN C); | [DA]US4743357 (PATEL KUNDANBHAI M [US], et al) | Examination | US4762817 | US5354935 |