EP0750443 - Piezoelectric acoustic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states TAIYO YUDEN CO., LTD. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanai, Yasuhiro, c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo, 110 / JP | 02 /
Ito, Hiroshi, c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo, 110 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Fumihisa, c/o Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd. 16-20, Ueno 6-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo, 110 / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109328.3 | 11.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950175452 | 19.06.1995 Original published format: JP 17545295 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750443 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750443 | Date: | 06.12.2000 | [2000/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04R17/02 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H04R17/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR [1996/52] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrisches akustisches Gerät | [1996/52] | English: | Piezoelectric acoustic device | [1996/52] | French: | Dispositif acoustique piézoélectrique | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 03.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6199500 ; | [XA]EP0595514 (TDK CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,8 * column 1, lines 3-7 * * column 3, lines 5-12 * * column 5, lines 9-35 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 24 * [A] 2,4-7; | [A]JPH0686391 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860920), vol. 010, no. 279, Database accession no. (E - 439), & JP61099500 A 19860517 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * [A] 3 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940629), vol. 018, no. 345, Database accession no. (E - 1571), & JP06086391 A 19940325 (TAIYO YUDEN CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |