EP0752333 - Actuator arrangement and device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [1997/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drobner, Hans Jürgen Hinter der Kelter 5 71229 Leonberg / DE | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm & Dauster Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109455.4 | 13.06.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | DE1995124068 | 01.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19524068 | [1997/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0752333 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0752333 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
B60H1/0065 (EP,US);
B60H1/00857 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6888 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | Aktuatoranordnung und diese verwendende Vorrichtung | [1997/02] | English: | Actuator arrangement and device using the same | [1997/02] | French: | Actionneur et dispositif l'utilisant | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 06.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/27] | 07.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5181553 (DOI KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 59; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XA]US4656926 (BAUER KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 3,5; | [A]US4880031 (FASOLINO GABRIEL V [US]) [A] * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 57; figures 1-5,9 *; | [A]US4681153 (UCHIDA NORIAKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 62; figure 3 *; | [X]US5036816 (MANN ARNOLD [DE]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 * |