Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0924727 | Global Dossier | 28.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19524068 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0752333 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1998 | A3 | EP0752333 | 08.01.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19524068 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19524068 | 02.01.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19524068 | 01.07.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5791981 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19524068 | 01.07.1995 |