EP0748593 - Bulk conveyor assembly for cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Pomponia, 10 40100 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states G.D SOCIETA' PER AZIONI Via Pomponia, 10 I-40100 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brizzi, Marco Via Predosa, 30 40069 Zola Predosa / IT | 02 /
Fiori, Marco Via Martin Luther King, 37 40132 Bologna / IT | 03 /
Gamberini, Antonio Via Nino Scota, 11 40100 Bologna / IT | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96109510.6 | 13.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | IT1995BO00301 | 14.06.1995 Original published format: IT BO950301 | [1996/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748593 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
B65G47/5154 (EP);
A24C5/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/51] | Title | German: | Transporteinheit für einen Strom von Zigaretten | [1996/51] | English: | Bulk conveyor assembly for cigarettes | [1996/51] | French: | Ensemble de transport pour un courant de cigarettes | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/27] | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1491032 (MOLINS LTD) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3343529 (SASIB SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2* figure 1 *; | [X]GB2135951 (GD SPA) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * |