Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0749227
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.11.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
03.12.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.12.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2004 |
Change - German title |
published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] |
29.06.2004 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.03.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
22.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.09.2003 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
14.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2003 |
First examination report |
|
02.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.07.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] |
22.09.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
07.07.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.02.1997 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] |
01.11.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |