EP0748780 - Translucent polycrystalline alumina and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [1996/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuk, Karlene J. 26 Preston Street Hathorne, Massachusetts 01915 / US | [1996/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109608.8 | 14.06.1996 | [1996/51] | Priority number, date | US19950491064 | 16.06.1995 Original published format: US 491064 | [1996/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0748780 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0748780 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/115 | [1996/51] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/51] | Title | German: | Lichtdurchlässiges polykristallines Aluminiumoxid und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1996/51] | English: | Translucent polycrystalline alumina and method of making same | [1996/51] | French: | Oxyde d'aluminium transparent et polycristallin et méthode de préparation | [1996/51] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/13] | 07.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU1511243 ; | [X]US3905845 (KOBAYASHI KAZUO, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, lines 35-69 * * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 4 *; | [AD]US4285732 (CHARLES RICHARD J, et al)[AD] 1-7; | [X]US4364877 (CLEMENT RENE, et al) [X] 1-5 * claim 6 *; | [X]US4699774 (PRUD HOMME VAN REINE PETER R [NL], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 1-5 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 20, Database accession no. 90-153330, XP002013165 & SU1511243 A 19890930 (KHARK CAR-ROAD INST) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |