EP0750405 - Cable loss equalization system used in wireless communication equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Masami c/o NEC Corp., 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Hiroki c/o NEC Engineering, Ltd. 18-21, Shibaura 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96109997.5 | 20.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19950154450 | 21.06.1995 Original published format: JP 15445095 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750405 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750405 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | [1997/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750405 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/06 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
H04B3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1996/52] | Title | German: | Kabeldämpfungsentzerrereinrichtung zur Anwendung in einer Funkkommunikationsanlage | [1996/52] | English: | Cable loss equalization system used in wireless communication equipment | [1996/52] | French: | Système d'égalisation des pertes d'un câble utilisé dans un dispositif de communication radio | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4768204 (ZEISS WILLI [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 10 - line 14 * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 24 - line 30 * * column 4, line 20 - line 23 *; | [A] - H.KRAAIJENBRINK, "Equalization of coaxial cables for video transmissions", HET PTT-BEDRIJF, (196903), vol. 16, no. 2, pages 101 - 107, XP002031559 [A] 1-5 * page 101, column L, line 16 - column R, line 5 * * page 101, column R, line 29 - line 30 * * page 101, column R, line 35 - line 46 * * page 102, column R, line 1 - line 4 * |