EP0763874 - Staged terminal block with a shunt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Paderborner Strasse 175 32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diekmann, Jörg Im stillen Winkel 25 33813 Helpup / DE | [1997/12] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110020.3 | 21.06.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | DE1995133992 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19533992 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0763874 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0763874 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | [1998/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0763874 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
H01R9/26 (EP);
H01R9/2675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/12] | Title | German: | Elektrische Etagenklemme mit einem Brücker | [1997/12] | English: | Staged terminal block with a shunt | [1997/12] | French: | Bornier étagé avec un pontage | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 23.04.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE8311219U (WAGO) [YD] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]DE4223540 (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) [Y] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [XP]EP0678934 (WIELAND ELEKTRISCHE INDUSTRIE [DE]) [XP] 1-3 * figure -; claim - * |