EP0753401 - Multilayered composite body and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlaaff, Louise, Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | For all designated states Schlaaff, Helmut P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | [1998/51] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Schlaaff, Louise, Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | ||
For all designated states Schlaaff, Helmut, Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlaaff, Louise Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | 02 /
Schlaaff, Helmut P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | [1998/50] |
Former [1997/03] | 01 /
Schlaaff, Louise Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | ||
02 /
Schlaaff, Helmut Dr. P.O. Box 726 2600 Baguio City / PH | Representative(s) | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwalt St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Motsch, Andreas Patentanwälte Motsch & Antritter St-Anna-Platz 4 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110093.0 | 21.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | DE1995210536U | 29.06.1995 Original published format: DE 29510536 U | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753401 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753401 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/10, B32B3/14, B32B27/36, A47B77/02 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
A47B77/06 (EP);
B29C39/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL [1997/03] | Title | German: | Schichtkörper und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1997/03] | English: | Multilayered composite body and method for its manufacture | [1997/03] | French: | Stratifié composite et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1996 | Examination requested [1997/03] | 21.06.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.05.1999 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH05321441 ; | [X]JPS5724128 ; | [DY]DE3734530 (KRAFT KG WILHELM [DE]) [DY] 1,4 * column 1, lines 25-32 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,3; claims 1,2,6,7,11,12 * * column 2, lines 1-3 - column 3, lines 1-5 *; | [Y]DE3501484 (COMPAKTA WERKE BAUSTOFF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,9 * page 4, line 8 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0229262 (SCHOCK & CO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,4,9 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 3; figures 6-12; claims 1,5-9 *; | [A]US4086318 (GARASI LOUIS A, et al) [A] 9,11 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2717377 (DIETER MEIRICH FA) [A] 9 * figure .; claim . *; | [A]US3839519 (WEINER G) [A] 10 * figures 11,2,3; claim 1 *; | [A]US3646180 (WINNICK JACK M) [A] 9 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE2828734 (COPENCRAFT AS) [A] 6,10 * figures 2,5; claims 1-3,5 *; | [A]GB1468532 (MANUF FR DES CHASUSSURES ERAM) [A] * figures 1-3; claims 1,4,9 *; | [A]GB2284378 (BRONZEPALM TECHNOLOGY LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 1,6,8,9 * figures 2A,2B; claims 1,3,12,11,15,17, * | [XAY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 02, Database accession no. 94-013062, XP002011204 & JPH05321441 A 00000000 (TAISEI CONSTR. CO. LTD.) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [A] 9-11 [Y] 2,3,8 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 24, Database accession no. 82-49375e, XP002011205 & JPS5724128 A 00000000 (INA SEITO KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * |