EP0817085 - Addressing means and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neustadter, Marc Ramban 44 Jerusalem 92268 / IL | 02 /
Shtayer, Ronen Zalman Shneor 32 Herzlia 46364 / IL | 03 /
Natan, Rami Michael 4 Ramat Gan 52363 / IL | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Section Law Department Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1998/02] | Richardt, Markus Albert Motorola GmbH, Hagenauerstrasse 47 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110204.3 | 25.06.1996 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0817085 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/28 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
G06F13/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/02] | G06F13/28, G06F13/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/02] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Adressierung | [1998/02] | English: | Addressing means and method | [1998/02] | French: | Moyens et méthode pour adressage | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 18.03.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 03.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.10.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/18] | Appeal following examination | 06.12.1999 | Appeal received No. T0313/01 | 12.02.2000 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.12.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 02.12.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 22.10.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.01.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2006 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2007 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0489504 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION) [X] 1-10 * column 10, line 38 - column 12, line 45; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0321156 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.) [A] 1,3,8 * page 23, line 1 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0359137 (NATIONAL SEMICONDUCTOR CORPORATION) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 57 - page 10, line 6 *; | [A] - "concurrent register loading from memory and register storing to I/O", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK US, (199301), vol. 36, no. 1, page 395, XP002021760 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |