EP0751284 - Cylinder head unit and method for producing a valve seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken, 438 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Shuhei c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Inami, Junichi c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K., 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110248.0 | 25.06.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | JP19950162693 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: JP 16269395 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751284 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0751284 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F01L3/22 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
F01L3/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/01] | Title | German: | Zylinderkopf und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Ventilsitzes | [1997/01] | English: | Cylinder head unit and method for producing a valve seat | [1997/01] | French: | Culasse et procédé pour la production d'un siège soupape | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 03.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/31] | 18.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0092683 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH02196117 ; | [A]DE3331145 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901023), vol. 014, no. 486, Database accession no. (M - 1038), & JP02196117 A 19900802 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |