EP0760437 - Device for damping car body vibrations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/24] |
Former [1997/10] | For all designated states Dr.Ing.h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 42 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jöst, Rainer Danziger Strasse 42/1 75417 Mühlacker / DE | 02 /
Paleczek, Josef Rappengasse 15/2 71262 Weil der Stadt / DE | [1997/10] | Application number, filing date | 96110483.3 | 28.06.1996 | [1997/10] | Priority number, date | DE1995132039 | 31.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19532039 | [1997/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0760437 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0760437 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/10, B62D37/04 | [1997/10] | CPC: |
B62D37/04 (EP);
F16F7/1017 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bedämpfen von Karosserieschwingungen | [1997/10] | English: | Device for damping car body vibrations | [1997/10] | French: | Dispositif d'amortissement des vibrations de carrosserie | [1997/10] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/41] | 20.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/23] | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH271285 (ANTISKID S A [CH]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [XY]US3917246 (GARTNER JOSEPH R, et al) [X] 1,2,5 * column W * [Y] 9,11; | [Y]DE4340007 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0538608 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [Y] 11 * the whole document *; | [PXA]US5456341 (GARNJOST KENNETH D [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,5,6 * column W * [A] 3,4; | [X]JPH04181040 ; | [A]WO9202382 (SAAB SCANIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-3,5 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921013), vol. 016, no. 494, Database accession no. (M - 1324), & JP04181040 A 19920629 (KAYABA IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | Examination | DE4413447 |