EP0751399 - Ferromagnetic resonance measuring cavity resonator and electron spin resonance measuring apparatus having same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumatoriya, Makoto, c/o Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Takashi, c/o Murata Manufact. Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [1997/01] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 82049 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110526.9 | 28.06.1996 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | JP19950186400 | 28.06.1995 Original published format: JP 18640095 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751399 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/345, H01P1/215 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
G01R33/345 (EP);
H01P1/215 (EP);
G01R33/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/01] | Title | German: | Hohlraumresonator zum Messen von ferromagnetischer Resonanz und Gerät zum Messen von Elektronspin-Resonanz umfassend denselben | [1997/01] | English: | Ferromagnetic resonance measuring cavity resonator and electron spin resonance measuring apparatus having same | [1997/01] | French: | Résonateur à cavité pour la mesure d'une résonance ferromagnétique et appareil de mesure de la résonance d'électrons incluant celui-ci | [1997/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1996 | Examination requested [1997/01] | 28.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4547754 (Y. MURAKAMI, H. YAMADA) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 41 - column 4, line 56 * | [DXA] - J.D. ADAMS ET AL., "Non-Destructive Evaluation of YIG Films by Ferromagnetic Resonance", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (1989), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 3488 - 3490, XP002014672 [DX] 1,4,5,7,10,11,13 * the whole article * [A] 2,3,6,8,9,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.42344 | [A] - SH. TAKEDA, "Non-Destructive delta H Measurement...", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, (1987), vol. 23, no. 5, pages 3340 - 3342, XP002014673 [A] 1-13 * the whole article * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.1987.1065405 |