EP0753680 - Joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAPAL Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge Dr. Kress KG Obere Bahnstrasse 13 D-73431 Aalen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states MAPAL Fabrik für Präzisionswerkzeuge Dr. Kress KG Obere Bahnstrasse 13 D-73431 Aalen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Gleiss, Alf-Olav Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/03] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing. Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110545.9 | 29.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | DE1995125463 | 14.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19525463 | [1997/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753680 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753680 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/08 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
F16D1/12 (EP,US);
Y10T403/1624 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7022 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/03] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstelle | [1997/03] | English: | Joint | [1997/03] | French: | Joint | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 18.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2089168 (BROWN PERRY W) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [A]DE1600199 (PLANETA VEB DRUCKMASCH WERKE) [A] 1-3,6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3002143 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [A] 1-5,8-10 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0341321 (IMK MAGNUSSON & CO [SE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE3032537 (DUERR DENTAL GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,4,6,7 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2335733 (VOEST AG [AT]) [A] 1,2,4,6-8 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3804655 (SKF BEWEGUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2,8-10 * abstract * |