EP0752324 - Utensils container, in particular for kitchen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bielefelder Küchenmaschinen- und Transportgeräte-Fabrik vom Braucke GmbH Telgenbrink 105 D-33739 Bielefeld / DE | [1997/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vom Braucke, Manfred Telgenbrink 103 33739 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
Vom Braucke, Hans Karlstrasse 23 32602 Vlotho / DE | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Hans-Jochen, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gustav Meldau Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans-Jochen Strauss Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Strauss, Hans-Jochen, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gustav Meldau Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans-Jochen Strauss Postfach 2452 33254 Gütersloh / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110654.9 | 02.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | DE1995210667U | 05.07.1995 Original published format: DE 29510667 U | [1997/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752324 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752324 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B43M17/00 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
B43M99/00 (EP,US);
Y10S211/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | Utensilienbehälter, insbesondere für Küchen | [1997/02] | English: | Utensils container, in particular for kitchen | [1997/02] | French: | Récipient pour ustensiles, en particulier pour cuisine | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.08.1999 | FI | 18.08.1999 | FR | 18.08.1999 | GB | 18.08.1999 | IT | 18.08.1999 | NL | 18.08.1999 | SE | 18.08.1999 | DK | 18.11.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 18.08.1999 | |
FI | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 18.08.1999 | ||
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
NL | 18.08.1999 | ||
SE | 18.08.1999 | ||
DK | 18.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | ES | 18.08.1999 | |
FI | 18.08.1999 | ||
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
NL | 18.08.1999 | ||
SE | 18.08.1999 | ||
DK | 18.11.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | ES | 18.08.1999 | |
FI | 18.08.1999 | ||
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
NL | 18.08.1999 | ||
SE | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 18.08.1999 | |
FI | 18.08.1999 | ||
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
SE | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | FI | 18.08.1999 | |
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
SE | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | FI | 18.08.1999 | |
GB | 18.08.1999 | ||
IE | 18.08.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | GB | 18.08.1999 | |
IE | 18.08.1999 | ||
FI | 19.11.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/07] | GB | 18.08.1999 | |
FI | 19.11.1999 | ||
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/06] | FI | 19.11.1999 | |
FR | 14.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 19.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2497332 (TEETOR MACY O) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2518401 (MAY THOMPSON WILLIE) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim - *; | [XY]EP0010354 (FOX MALCOLM FRANCIS [GB]) [X] 1,16 * page 25, line 1 - line 15; figure 7 * * abstract * [Y] 5-10; | [YA]DE9104092U (HERLITZ) [Y] 5-10 * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 15, paragraph L; figure - * [A] 1; | [A]DE9104143U (HERLITZ) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph L - page 16, paragraph L; figure - * |