EP0752314 - Ink-jet recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubota, Hidemi c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Isao c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Hiroyuki c/o Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96110923.8 | 05.07.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | JP19950194035 | 07.07.1995 Original published format: JP 19403595 | [1997/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0752314 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0752314 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | [1997/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752314 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/05 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04588 (EP,US);
B41J2/04598 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/02] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren | [1997/02] | English: | Ink-jet recording method | [1997/02] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 12.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 24.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0649399 (CANON KK) [DA] 1; | US5439515 [ ] (KURABAYASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [ ] * column 1, line 1 - line 35; figure 1A; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0618278 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 50 - line 53 * * page 3, line 3 - line 16 *; | [A]EP0329026 (DATAPRODUCTS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - line 19 * * page 3, line 45 - line 51 *; | [D]JPH01272673 (DATAPRODUCTS CORP); | [A]JPH0365345 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910606), vol. 015, no. 222, Database accession no. (M - 1121), & JP03065345 A 19910320 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | EP0704504 |