EP0755836 - Mastercylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/04] |
Former [1997/05] | For all designated states ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Harald Gartenstrasse 7 61239 Obermörlen / DE | 02 /
Kreh, Heinrich Anton-Lux-Ring 11 61197 Florstadt / DE | 03 /
Jungmann, Udo Karlstrasse 9 64546 Mörfelden / DE | [1997/05] | Application number, filing date | 96111174.7 | 11.07.1996 | [1997/05] | Priority number, date | DE1995127655 | 28.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19527655 | [1997/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755836 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755836 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/20 | [1997/05] | CPC: |
B60T11/20 (EP);
B60T11/236 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/05] | Title | German: | Geberzylinder | [1997/05] | English: | Mastercylinder | [1997/05] | French: | Maître-cylindre | [1997/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 29.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5187934 (MORI KOHEI [JP]) [DY] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]DE2026756 (FIAT) [Y] 1,2 * column 6, line 49 - line 53 * * column 7, line 24 - line 30 * * column 8, line 26 - line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0327357 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 3-6,9,10 * column 2, line 44 - line 49 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 15; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0067100 (BENDIX CORP [US]) [X] 7 * figure 1; claim 6 * |