EP0778414 - Diagnostic system for capacitive discharge ignition system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altronic, Inc. 712 Trumbull Avenue Girard Ohio 44420 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/24] | For all designated states Altronic, Inc. 712 Trumbull Avenue Girard, Ohio 44420 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lepley, Joseph M. 5602 Greenbriar Drive Girard, Ohio 44420 / US | 02 /
Kleinfelder, Gary A. 247 West Market Street Mercer, Pennsylvania 16137 / US | [1997/24] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Wolf, Günter An der Mainbrücke 16 Postfach 700245 63427 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1997/24] | Wolf, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Amthor u. Wolf, An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111406.3 | 16.07.1996 | [1997/24] | Priority number, date | US19950568492 | 07.12.1995 Original published format: US 568492 | [1997/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0778414 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0778414 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0778414 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02P17/12 | [1997/24] | CPC: |
F02P17/12 (EP,US);
F02P3/0838 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1997/24] | Title | German: | Diagnosesystem für Kondensatorzündsysteme | [1997/24] | English: | Diagnostic system for capacitive discharge ignition system | [1997/24] | French: | Système de diagnostic pour un système d'allumage par décharge capacitive | [1997/24] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2003 | BE | 05.03.2003 | FR | 05.03.2003 | IT | 05.03.2003 | GB | 16.07.2003 | LU | 16.07.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
FR | 05.03.2003 | ||
GB | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
GB | 16.07.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
LU | 16.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 05.03.2003 | |
BE | 05.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 05.03.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06299944 ; | [A]US4887581 (OKUDA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US5019779 (OOKAWA KIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5221904 (SHIMASAKI YUUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5327090 (SHIMASAKI YUUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 9 *; | [A]EP0659999 (SIMMONDS PRECISION ENGINE SYST [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 2, line 1 - line 36 * * column 3, line 18 - column 6, line 34; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 095, no. 001, & JP06299944 A 19941025 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract * |