EP0764487 - Free form fabrication of metallic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bampton, Clifford C. 405 Bethany Street Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
Burkett, Robert 1464 Crater Street Simi Valley, CA 93063 / US | 03 /
Ryang, Hong-Son 117 Encino Avenue Camarillo, CA 93010 / US | [1997/13] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111522.7 | 17.07.1996 | [1997/13] | Priority number, date | US19950530770 | 19.09.1995 Original published format: US 530770 | [1997/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0764487 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0764487 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105 | [1997/13] | CPC: |
B22F3/10 (EP,US);
B22F1/09 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F10/16 (EP,US);
B22F10/34 (EP,US);
B22F10/43 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B22F10/37 (EP,US);
B22F10/47 (EP,US);
B22F2003/1042 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/09 (US,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F10/16, B22F3/1021, B22F3/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/13] | Title | German: | Formenlose Herstellung von Metallkörper | [1997/13] | English: | Free form fabrication of metallic components | [1997/13] | French: | Préparation d'ébauches métalliques sans moule | [1997/13] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/44] | 22.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9210343 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 17, line 32 - page 18, line 2 * * page 21, line 24 - page 23, line 2 *; | [Y]US5342573 (AMANO YOSHINARI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3* claims 1,4 * |