EP0755034 - Movement pattern recognizing apparatus for detecting movements of human bodies and the number of passing persons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/04] | Movement pattern recognizing apparatus for detecting movements of human bodies and number of passed persons | ||
[2000/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0050 / JP | ||
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Kazuhiko 8-2-905, Keihanhondori 1-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | 02 /
Yoshiike, Nobuyuki 3-17, Asukanokita 3-chome Ikoma-shi, Nara 630-01 / JP | 03 /
Matsueda, Satoshi 20757-77, Shimotajima, Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-gun, Miyazaki 880-02 / JP | 04 /
Kawaguchi, Chihiro 11-1, Komatsudainishi 1-chome Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki 880 / JP | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111530.0 | 17.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | JP19950182611 | 19.07.1995 Original published format: JP 18261195 | JP19950218828 | 28.08.1995 Original published format: JP 21882895 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0755034 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0755034 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/191, G07C9/00 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
G07C9/00 (EP,US);
G06V40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/04] | Title | German: | Bewegungsmuster-Erkennungseinrichtung zum Bestimmen der Bewegung von Menschen sowie zum Zählen vorbeigegangener Personen | [2000/16] | English: | Movement pattern recognizing apparatus for detecting movements of human bodies and the number of passing persons | [2000/16] | French: | Dispositif de reconnaissance de motifs de mouvement des corps humain et dispositif de comptage de personnes associé | [1997/04] |
Former [1997/04] | Mustererkennungseinrichtung zum Bestimmen der Bewegung von Menschen sowie zum Zählen vorbeigegangener Personen | ||
Former [1997/04] | Movement pattern recognizing apparatus for detecting movements of human bodies and number of passed persons | Examination procedure | 27.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/17] | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9210812 (IRIS GMBH I G INFRARED & INTEL [DE]) [Y] 1,9,19 * page 12, line 10 - page 14, line 10; figures 1,7 *; | [Y]US5101194 (SHEFFER ELIEZER A [US]) [Y] 1,9,19 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 55; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]US4799243 (ZEPKE BRUCE E [US]) [Y] 1,9,19 * abstract * * column 7, line 43 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0345878 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]EP0588643 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract *; | [A]DE4220508 (IRIS GMBH INFRARED & INTELLIGE [DE]) [A] * column 11, line 37 - column 12, line 8; figure 8 *; | [DA]JPH05324955 ; | [DA]JPH0495794 ; | [A]JPH01140279 ; | [A]DE3832428 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] * abstract * | [A] - NAKAMURA J ET AL, "ALGORITHM FOR COUNTING THE NUMBER OF PERSONS USING IR IMAGE PROCESSING", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES IN I & M HAMAMATSU, MAY 10 - 12, 1994, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19940510), vol. 1, pages 220 - 223, XP000507293 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1994.352087 | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940315), vol. 18, no. 156, Database accession no. (P - 1710), & JP05324955 A 19931210 (KAZUO NAKAZAWA ET AL) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920715), vol. 16, no. 323, Database accession no. (P - 1386), & JP04095794 A 19920327 (NIPPON AVIONICS) [DA] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890830), vol. 13, no. 391, Database accession no. (P - 926)<3739>, & JP01140279 A 19890601 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS) [A] * abstract * |