EP0754928 - Segmenting warhead projectile and method for detonating such a warhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/04] | Segmenting warhead projectile | ||
[1999/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primex Technologies, Inc. 10101 9th Street North St. Petersburg, FL 33716-3807 / US | [2000/10] |
Former [1999/37] | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 91 Shelton Avenue New Haven, CT 06511-1837 / US | ||
Former [1997/04] | For all designated states OLIN CORPORATION 350 Knotter Drive P.O. Box 586 Cheshire, CT 06410-0586 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sigler, John W. 13129 Stern Avenue La Mirada, California 90638 / US | [1997/04] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111626.6 | 18.07.1996 | [1997/04] | Priority number, date | US19950492460 | 20.07.1995 Original published format: US 492460 | [1997/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0754928 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0754928 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/20, F42B12/62 | [1997/04] | CPC: |
F42B12/204 (EP,US);
F42B12/208 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/04] | Title | German: | Geschoss das sich bei der Zündung in zwei Teile teilt und Explosionsverfahren dafür | [1999/43] | English: | Segmenting warhead projectile and method for detonating such a warhead | [1999/43] | French: | Projectile qui se transforme en deux parties pendant l'allumage et méthode pour sa détonation | [1999/43] |
Former [1997/04] | Geschoss das sich bei der Zündung in zwei Teile teilt | ||
Former [1997/04] | Segmenting warhead projectile | ||
Former [1997/04] | Projectile qui se transforme en deux parties pendant l'allumage | Examination procedure | 04.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.08.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   04.08.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3703774 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2184028 (WESLEY URBAN) [A] 1,9 * page 1, column R, line 6 - page 2, column L, line 34; figure 2 *; | [A]US443163 (E. SHURTLEFF) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 7-25; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 32-50 * * column 4, lines 25-49 *; | [A]DE3703773 (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]US3494284 (GROSS BERNARD A) |