EP0758701 - Tilt linkage arrangement for an excavator implement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hendron, Scott Svend 17090 Mountain Ridge Road Dubuque, Iowa 52002 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Michael Eugene 900 Valentine Drive Dubuque, Iowa 52003 / US | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1997/08] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 96111763.7 | 22.07.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | US19950515851 | 16.08.1995 Original published format: US 515851 | [1997/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758701 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758701 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, E02F3/30 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
E02F3/425 (EP,US);
E02F3/30 (EP,US);
E02F3/306 (EP,US);
E02F3/3604 (EP,US);
E02F3/964 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/08] | Title | German: | Kippgestängeanordnung für ein Baggerwerkzeug | [1997/08] | English: | Tilt linkage arrangement for an excavator implement | [1997/08] | French: | Agencement d'articulation pour un outil d'excavatrice | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/09] | 14.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 31.03.2001 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 11.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2001 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request deemed not to be filed | 23.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 24.02.2001 | Appeal received | 31.03.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | Divisional application(s) | EP00123817.9 / EP1074664 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3130843 (KELLY ALEC J) [A] 1,2 * figure 4 *; | [A]DE1948967 (WESERHUETTE AG EISENWERK) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US4768917 (GARMAN ANTHONY L [US]) [AD] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [AP]US5486084 (PITMAN RAYMOND F [US], et al) [AP] 1,2* figures 19-21,23 * |