EP0758818 - Surface-skimming bulk wave substrate and device including same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/08] | Surface-skimming bulk wave substrate, device including same and method | ||
[1999/15] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 West Boulevard North Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [1999/50] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penunuri, David 10422 N. Demaret Drive Fountain Hils, Arizona 85268 / US | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1997/08] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96111994.8 | 25.07.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | US19950515399 | 15.08.1995 Original published format: US 515399 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758818 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758818 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/02 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
H03H9/02559 (EP,US);
H03H3/08 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FI, FR, GB [1997/08] | Title | German: | Surface-Skimming-Bulk-Welle-Substrat, und diese enthaltende Vorrichtung | [1999/15] | English: | Surface-skimming bulk wave substrate and device including same | [1999/15] | French: | Substrat pour ondes acoustiques de masse superficielle et dispositif comprenant le même | [1999/15] |
Former [1997/08] | Surface-Skimming-Bulk-Welle-Substrat, diese enthaltende Vorrichtung sowie Verfahren | ||
Former [1997/08] | Surface-skimming bulk wave substrate, device including same and method | ||
Former [1997/08] | Substrat pour ondes acoustiques de masse superficielle, dispositif comprenant le même et procédé | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/42] | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
20.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE Epcos AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE Opponent's representative Epping, Wilhelm Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.12.2000
Epcos AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE Opponent's representative Epping, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Epping Hermann & Fischer Postfach 12 10 26 80034 München / DE | 23.03.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.11.2002 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/04] | Appeal following opposition | 21.05.2002 | Appeal received No. T0607/02 | 22.11.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor inadmissible | Request for further processing for: | 18.11.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6153200 ; |