EP0822268 - Process for depositing adherent diamond thin films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michigan State University 238 Administration Building East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states MICHIGAN STATE UNIVERSITY 238 Administration Building East Lansing, Michigan 48824 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulczynski, Michael J. 1491 Bay Meadows Okemos, Michigan 48864 / US | 02 /
Asmussen, Jes 3811 Viceroy Okemos, Michigan 48864 / US | 03 /
Reinhard, Donnie K. 526 Mashall Street East Lansing, Michigan 48823 / US | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112277.7 | 30.07.1996 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822268 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822268 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C16/44 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
C23C16/274 (EP);
C23C16/277 (EP);
C23C16/452 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer haftenden Diamantbeschichtung | [1998/06] | English: | Process for depositing adherent diamond thin films | [1998/06] | French: | Procédé de production d'un revêtement de diamant adhérent | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1996 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0457076 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 29 - line 30; example 1 *; | [Y] - GONON P ET AL, "RAMAN STUDY OF DIAMOND FILMS DEPOSITED BY MPCVD: EFFECT OF THE SUBSTRATE POSITION", THIN SOLID FILMS, (19950201), vol. 256, no. 1/02, pages 13 - 22, XP000495251 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUES* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(94)06306-0 | [Y] - HIRAMATSU M ET AL, "Hydrogen-radical-assisted radio-frequency plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition system for diamond formation", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, JUNE 1996, AIP, USA, ISSN 0034-6748, vol. 67, no. 6, pages 2360 - 2365, XP000615708 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENT* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1146946 | [Y] - KIM H ET AL, "Effect of the substrate state on the formation of diamond film in a low temperature microwave-plasma-enhanced chemical vapor deposition system", 41ST NATIONAL SYMPOSIUM OF THE AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, DENVER, CO, USA, 24-29 OCT. 1994, ISSN 0734-2101, JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY A (VACUUM, SURFACES, AND FILMS), MAY-JUNE 1995, USA, vol. 13, no. 3, pt.2, pages 1619 - 1623, XP000615711 [Y] 1,2 *EXPERIMENT* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.579740 | [AD] - MASOOD A ET AL, "Techniques for patterning of CVD diamond films on non-diamond substrates", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, NOV. 1991, USA, ISSN 0013-4651, vol. 138, no. 11, pages L67 - L68, XP000615408 [AD] 8 * page L67, column L, line 26 - column R, line 17 * | [A] - NARIMAN K E ET AL, "GROWTH OF FREE-STANDING DIAMOND FILMS ON GLASS", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, (19910501), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 391 - 394, XP000321249 [A] 9 * page 392, column L, line 43 - line 50 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm00015a008 | [A] - REIHARD D K ET AL, "Diamond coatings on integrated circuits", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002021717 [A] 10 * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE APPLIED DIAMOND CONFERENCE 1995. APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERIALS: THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (NIST SP 885), PROCEEDINGS OF 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERI, 1995, GAITHERSBURG, MD, USA, NIST, USA, pages 643 - 646 vol.1 | [A] - ULCZYNSKI M ET AL, "Thin film diamond coatings on glass", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002021718 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE APPLIED DIAMOND CONFERENCE 1995. APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERIALS: THIRD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (NIST SP 885), PROCEEDINGS OF 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE APPLICATIONS OF DIAMOND FILMS AND RELATED MATERI, 1995, GAITHERSBURG, MD, USA, NIST, USA, pages 573 - 576 vol.1 |