EP0751095 - Vapour recovery system in fuel filling installations [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUOVOPIGNONE INDUSTRIE MECCANICHE E FONDERIA S.p.A. Via F. Matteucci 2 50127 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | For all designated states NUOVOPIGNONE INDUSTRIE MECCANICHE E FONDERIA S.p.A. Via F. Matteucci 2 I-50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergamini, Giorgio Via Camillo Rosalba, 46F I-70124 Bari / IT | 02 /
Paris, Ernesto Via Ettore Carafa, 19 I-70124 Bari / IT | [1997/01] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96112396.5 | 01.07.1993 | [1997/01] | Priority number, date | US19920945222 | 15.09.1992 Original published format: US 945222 | [1997/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0751095 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/04 | [1997/01] | CPC: |
B67D7/0486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/01] | Title | German: | Rückgewinnungseinrichtung für Dämpfe in Kraftstoff-Abgabevorrichtungen | [1997/01] | English: | Vapour recovery system in fuel filling installations | [1997/01] | French: | Système de récupération de vapeurs dans une installation de distribution de carburants | [1997/01] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/36] | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93201921.9 / EP0588393 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9110431U (TANKANLAGEN SALZKOTTEN) [A] 1 * page 3, line 7 - page 5, line 17 * * figure . *; | [A]EP0461770 (GILBARCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 2 - column 5, line 49; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0460864 (TOKYO TATSUNO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 39 * * figure 8 *; | [A]DE4038579 (SCHONDORF HANS JOCHEN DIPL ING [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 7 - line 20 * * figure . *; | [PA]EP0511599 (DRESSER IND [US]) [PA] 1,2 * column 4, line 39 - column 6, line 22 * * figure 2 * |