EP0758110 - Carrying case for EDP system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1997/07] | Carrying case or EDP system | ||
[1998/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2000 [2000/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARAT-WERK SCHÖNENBACH GmbH + Co KG Tenter Weg 1-3 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | For all designated states PARAT-WERK SCHÖNENBACH GmbH + Co KG Tenter Weg 1-3 D-42897 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönenbach, Heinz Poststrasse 18 42897 Remscheid-Lennep / DE | [1997/07] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/07] | Patentanwälte Ostriga & Sonnet Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112433.6 | 01.08.1996 | [1997/07] | Priority number, date | DE19952012818U | 09.08.1995 Original published format: DE 29512818 U | [1997/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758110 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0758110 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16 | [1997/07] | CPC: |
G06F1/1628 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL [1998/37] |
Former [1997/07] | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | EDV-System-Koffer | [1997/07] | English: | Carrying case for EDP system | [1998/33] | French: | Mallette de transport pour système informatique | [1997/07] |
Former [1997/07] | Carrying case or EDP system | Examination procedure | 16.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 17.06.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4929948 (HOLMBERG GOERAN I [US]) [X] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, line 15 - line 26; figure 1 * [A] 4-7; | [XA]DE9105721U (KLEY BERNHARD) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 1 - line 6; figures 1-3 * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 6 * * page 6, line 2 - line 5 *[A] 4-7; | [XA]DE29502538U (BORMANN HANS JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 8; figure 1 * [A] 4 |