EP0740324 - Method of manufacturing an electron-emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2000 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomida, Yoshinori, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Kawade, Hisaaki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Niibe, Masahito, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 04 /
Ohnishi, Toshikazu, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | 05 /
Okamura, Yoshimasa, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146 / JP | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96112543.2 | 21.12.1994 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | JP19930345477 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34547793 | JP19930345478 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: JP 34547893 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740324 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740324 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740324 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/02 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
H01J9/027 (EP,US);
H01J1/316 (EP,US);
H01J2201/3165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/44] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer elektronemittierenden Vorrichtung | [1996/44] | English: | Method of manufacturing an electron-emitting device | [1996/44] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une dispositif d'émission d'électrons | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94120340.8 / EP0660359 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.1999 | BE | 21.04.1999 | CH | 21.04.1999 | ES | 21.04.1999 | GR | 21.04.1999 | IT | 21.04.1999 | LI | 21.04.1999 | NL | 21.04.1999 | SE | 21.04.1999 | DK | 21.07.1999 | PT | 23.07.1999 | IE | 21.12.1999 | LU | 21.12.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
LU | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
DK | 21.07.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
NL | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
ES | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
SE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
GR | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
IE | 21.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
CH | 21.04.1999 | ||
LI | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
CH | 26.07.1999 | ||
LI | 26.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
PT | 23.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.04.1999 | |
BE | 21.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 21.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6382788 ; | [A]JPH04147888 ; | [A]EP0343645 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - line 44 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 13 * * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880824), vol. 012, no. 311, Database accession no. (M - 734), & JP63082788 A 19880413 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920910), vol. 016, no. 434, Database accession no. (M - 1308), & JP04147888 A 19920521 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |