EP0762790 - Multi-cellular radio system with PBX and peripheral modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langmantel, Ernst Matthias-Wagner-Gasse 13 1210 Wien / AT | [1997/11] | Application number, filing date | 96112546.5 | 02.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE1995131999 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19531999 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762790 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762790 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0762790 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/26 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
H04M3/42382 (EP,US);
H04W84/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/11] | Title | German: | Mehrzellenfunksystem mit PBX-Peripheriebaugruppen | [1997/11] | English: | Multi-cellular radio system with PBX and peripheral modules | [1997/11] | French: | Système radio multi-cellulaire avec autocommutateur privé et modules périphériques | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 27.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO9618274 (SIEMENS AG ALBIS [CH], et al) [PA] 1-10 * page 4, line 2 - line 4; figure 1 *; | [DA]WO9416531 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * |